Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
April L Hatecke filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryProbate/Formal |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2022275586 Book: 8345 Page: 3945 View: 2022275586 | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Dsc | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | by Diane Collini | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | by Alexander L. Koszo, Jr. | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | by April L. Hatecke | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Inventory & Dsc. w/evidence of delivery | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | to Benef's regarding Amended Inventory | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | & Acctg. | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | for Dsc | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | for Discharge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.