Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Joseph Tanis filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryProbate/Formal |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2022242496 Book: 8328 Page: 576 View: 2022242496 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Dsc | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benf Cns to Dsc by James Spaeth | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benf Cns to Dsc by Joseph Tanis and Irene Tanis | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benf Cns to Dsc by Joan Fanning | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benf Cns to Dsc by Patricia Mirrer | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Untimely Filed Claim of Halifax Health, Inc | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Halifax Hospital Medical Center | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Halifax Healthcare Systems, Inc | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Halifax Health Inc. for $250.00, esvd. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.