Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Susan A Deveney, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case against Sean R Davis, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
CategoryVulnerable Adult Injunction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Drummond Bank on 7/17/21 | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Sean R. Davis on 7/6/21 | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Petiton for Injunction Against Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult Instrument: 2021157062 Book: 8077 Page: 3721 View: 2021157062 | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | OR Dismissing Ptn for Injunction | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Peyton Quarles, Esq. o/b/o Respondent, Sean R. Davis | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | of Injunction Against Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | from DCF Adul PS Re: No open or priot reports involving this individual | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | from Clerk to Levy County Sheriff Re: Service on Drummond Bank | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | of Temp. Injunction for Protection Against Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | (copy sent via email to DCF Adult PS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.