Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anna Yurko, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Craig R Lynd, against Skyla Sollowen, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeBefore Hearing - Other |
by Skyla Sollowen
Date: March 31, 2023w/prej Instrument: 2023107616 Book: 8411 Page: 4279 View: 2023107616
Date: May 16, 2023to Volusia County Fire Services et al
Date: August 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | w/prej Instrument: 2023107616 Book: 8411 Page: 4279 View: 2023107616 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | by Skyla Sollowen | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | to Dr John P Handago MD et al | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | of proposal for settlement by Anna Yurko | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | (3rd re) of Anna Yurko | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | to Skyla Sollowen by Anna Yurko | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | to Bedivere Ins Co | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | (amd/2nd re-notice) of Anna Yurko | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | (2nd re-notice) of Anna Yurko | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | of verified answers to interrogs by Skyla Sollowen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.