Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gabriel Edwards, filed a(n) Other Civil - Circuit case against Perriwinkle Properties Inc, represented by Renee M Smith, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeAfter Hearing - Other |
(amd) by Reliant Title Group Inc
Date: October 10, 2022and costs by Elizabeth Waldren
Date: November 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Appeal 5D22-2778 Instrument: 2023007163 Book: 8356 Page: 1344 View: 2023007163 | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | 5d-22-2778 amended, civil final | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | from 5th DCA 5D22-2778 | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal by Gabriel M Edwards Instrument: 2022282525 Book: 8349 Page: 2371 View: 2022282525 | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Appeal Filing Fee Letter sent to Gabriel Edwards | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | by Gabriel M Edwards Instrument: 2022260492 Book: 8337 Page: 4556 View: 2022260492 | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | from 5th DCA- RE New Appeal | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Appeal Information Letter sent to Gabriel M Edwards | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | motions for sanctions and motion for attorneys' fees by Volusia Title Services Inc etc et al | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | of Appeal (Appears to be Duplicate that was sent to us from the 5th DCA & Set up on 11/22/22) rcd $ with this one |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.