Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Alyssa Amodeo filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryProbate/Formal |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2023110449 Book: 8413 Page: 2175 View: 2023110449 | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Dsc | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Fml. Ntc. w/evidence of delivery | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benf. Cns to Dsc by Lauren Amodeo | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | for Discharge until 04/30/23 | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | (Second) for Filing Final Acctg. & Pet. For Dsc. | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | by Victoria Amodeo | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | for Discharge | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | for Closing addtl 6 months | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | from Southeastern Emerg. Physicians |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.