Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Robert Duran, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategorySummary Administration $1,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Bank of America, N.A, $6,099.41 | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Intestate Instrument: 2021101999 Book: 8040 Page: 1168 View: 2021101999 | |
April 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Follow-up, Intestate Summary | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended - Intestate Pro Se | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | to be addressed w/in 30 days. | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Intestate/Summary | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Intestate, w/copy of Primerica acct, **PRO SE** | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Maria Delscorro Ramirez | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | by Robert L Duran |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.