Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Eugene M Dixon, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategorySummary Administration $1,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Intestate Instrument: 2021026604 Book: 7985 Page: 1315 View: 2021026604 | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Summary/Intestate | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | by Brittany A. Dixon | |
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event | by Jennifer M. Dixon | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Intestate | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Jacqulyn Robinson Dixon | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.