Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Buffie Denise Randolph, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategorySummary Administration $1,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Intestate Instrument: 2021236920 Book: 8130 Page: 1314 View: 2021236920 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Follow Up Summary Testate | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2021139177 Book: 8065 Page: 2580 View: 2021139177 | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | follow up review-homestead. | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Formal Ntc of Amended Ptn for Summary and Ptn to Detm Hmstd w/evidence of delivery | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Objection to Claim w/evidence of delivery | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | by Wells Fargo Bank for $1,635.00, e-svd. | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | & Hmst. | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | of Amended & Hmst. | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | by Rooms to Go for $3,030.86, e-svd. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.