Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Justine Thames, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Jonathan I Rotstein, against Wal Mart Stores East Lp, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2020 |
CategoryPremises Liability/Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeBefore Hearing - Other |
This complaint is an amended notice of hearing in a case between Justine Thames (the plaintiff) and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (the defendant). The issue at hand is the plaintiff's motion to compel a response to discovery. The hearing is scheduled for ...
by Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Date: April 27, 2022to Radiology Assoc Imaging et al
Date: March 31, 2022by Justine Thames
Date: April 29, 2022to Radiology Assoc Imaging et al
Date: March 07, 2022Dfnt's response to discovery by Justine Thames
Date: October 21, 2021of answers to interrogs by Justine Thames
Date: March 10, 2022to Quintairos Prieto Wood & Boyer PA
Date: March 07, 2022Amended
Date: November 04, 2021Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Date: October 21, 2021by Justine Thames
Date: March 01, 2022of Darius Hall
Date: October 28, 2021of Michelle Peixeria et al
Date: October 27, 2021Wal-Mart Stores East LP to 3rd req for production
Date: October 11, 2021Wal Mart Stores East LP to 2nd req for production
Date: September 04, 2021of Darius Hall et al
Date: October 12, 2021(3rd) to Wal-Mart Stores East LP by Justine Thames
Date: September 09, 2021(2nd) to Wal Mart Stores East LP by Justine Thames
Date: September 04, 2021by Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Date: August 26, 2021Justine Thames to 2nd req for production
Date: August 25, 2021(2nd) to Justine Thames by Walmart Stores East LP
Date: August 20, 2021by Justine Thames 3 days
Date: August 13, 2021before Rick Singer Esq
Date: March 01, 2022Andrew S Bolin in place of Eric V Tourian obo Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Date: December 18, 2021of Michelle Peixeria et al
Date: January 10, 2022Justine Thames of non-objection
Date: March 14, 2022Wal-Mart Stores East LP of privilege log
Date: May 19, 2021Wal Mart Stores East LP to Req for Production
Date: May 18, 2021to Justine Thames by Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Date: February 23, 2022to Radiology Associates Imaging et al
Date: February 23, 2022Andrew S Bolin obo Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Date: January 28, 2022of Darius Hall
Date: August 02, 2021by Justine Thames
Date: November 09, 2021of ans to interrogs by Justine Thames
Date: February 25, 2021to Dr Matthew Hill DC et al
Date: April 06, 2021to AdventHealth Daytona Beach et al
Date: March 30, 2021(amd) of Justine Thames
Date: February 22, 2021Justine Thames to req for production
Date: February 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | w/prej by Justine Thames Instrument: 2022129473 Book: 8261 Page: 3598 View: 2022129473 | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | by Justine Thames | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | by Wal-Mart Stores East LP | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event | to Radiology Assoc Imaging et al | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Justine Thames of non-objection | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | of answers to interrogs by Justine Thames | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | to Radiology Assoc Imaging et al | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | to Quintairos Prieto Wood & Boyer PA | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | by Justine Thames | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | before Rick Singer Esq |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.