Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Apex Roofing And Restoration Llc A A O Marcelo Anayas, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeAfter Hearing - Other |
by S. Darick Crumbly Esq
Date: August 11, 2020of S. Darick Crumbly Esq obo State Farm Florida Insurance Company
Date: August 11, 2020to State Farm Florida Insurance Company
Date: July 02, 2020by Robert Gonzalez
Date: July 02, 2020appraisal by State Farm Florida Insurance Company & to stay proceedings
Date: August 24, 2020CFO obo State Farm Florida Ins Co
Date: July 27, 2020Law Firm's name to Andrew J Gorman & Associates
Date: June 01, 2021State Farm Florida Insurance Company to req for production
Date: September 04, 2020Apex Roofing & Restoration LLC for pretrial
Date: March 08, 2021of ans to interrogs by State Farm Florida Insurance Company
Date: September 04, 2020appraisal & stay proceedings
Date: April 08, 2021Apex Roofing and Restoration LLC etc to Mtn to Compel Appraisal and Stay Proceedings
Date: March 29, 2021Apex Roofing & Restoration LLC etc of selection of appraiser
Date: April 05, 2021by Apex Roofing and Restoration LLC etc
Date: September 02, 2021Pltf's Ntc of Setting Action for Jury Trial by State Farm Florida Ins Co
Date: March 30, 2021prop jury instructions and verdict form by Apex Roofing etc
Date: April 23, 2021by Apex Roofing & Restoration LLC JT/3days
Date: March 08, 2021by Apex Roofing & Restoration LLC
Date: March 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | w/prej by Apex Roofing & Restoration LLC aao Marcello Anayas Instrument: 2021279205 Book: 8158 Page: 3134 View: 2021279205 | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | by Apex Roofing and Restoration LLC etc | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Law Firm's name to Andrew J Gorman & Associates | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | prop jury instructions and verdict form by Apex Roofing etc | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | appraisal & stay proceedings | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Apex Roofing & Restoration LLC etc of selection of appraiser | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Pltf's Ntc of Setting Action for Jury Trial by State Farm Florida Ins Co | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Apex Roofing and Restoration LLC etc to Mtn to Compel Appraisal and Stay Proceedings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.