Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Apex Roofing And Restoration Llc Aao Migdalia And Miguel Alers, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 07, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Matter TypeAfter Hearing - Other |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | w/prej by Apex Roofing & Restoration LLC aao Migdalia & Miguel Alers Instrument: 2021274381 Book: 8155 Page: 1932 View: 2021274381 | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | by Apex Roofing and Restoration LLC etc | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Katherine L Koener Esq obo American Integrity Ins Co of FL | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | American Integrity Ins Co of FL | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | of Katherine L Koener Esq obo American Integrity Ins Co of FL w/designation | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | of Katherine L Koener Esq obo American Integrity Ins Co of FL | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | of CMO by Apex Roofing and Restoration LLC etc | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | of Nicola Mitry Esq obo Apex Roofing and Restoration LLc etc w/designation | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.