Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against Maricio Chiropractic Group Inc, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand with Michael S. Orfinger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael S. Orfinger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Affirmed Instrument: 2019060539 Book: 7674 Page: 1 View: 2019060539 | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Certiorari, Order denying dfts mtn to disqualify pltfs law firm Quashed and cases are remanded to trial court for entry of order disqualifying law firm of Simoes & Davila PLLC Instrument: 2018213097 Book: 7613 Page: 377 View: 2018213097 | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | to Hon. Michael S Orfinger | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | to Appendix, 17 thur 19 | |
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event | #1-#12 to appendix to petition for Writ of Certiorari | |
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event | #13 to appendix to petition for Writ of Certiorari | |
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event | to petition for Writ of Certiorari | |
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event | by State Farm | |
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.