Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Khadijah Brooks, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Adisle Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand with Randell H. Rowe, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandell H. Rowe, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Case Outcome TypeBefore Hearing - Other |
Centra Care Sanford
Date: August 05, 2019proposal for settlement by Adisle Garcia
Date: February 11, 2019Joshua M Parks obo Adisle Garcia and designation of email
Date: October 30, 2018to Khadijah Y Brooks by Adisle Garcia
Date: May 01, 2018by Khadijah Brooks w/ prop order
Date: December 26, 2017to Adisle Garcia
Date: December 26, 2017To ADISLE GARCIA fwd to pltf's atty via e-service for SOP
Date: December 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | w/prej by Khadijah Brooks Instrument: 2019230180 Book: 7777 Page: 2672 View: 2019230180 | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | by Khadjian Brooks | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ||
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | (Expert & Update) to Khadijah Y Brooks by Adisle Garcia | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | (Expert Witness) to Khadijah Y Brooks by Adisle Garcia | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | (Update) to Khadijah Y Brooks by Adisle Garcia | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | by Joshua M Parks Esq | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ||
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Eric Didia | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Logan J Young obo Khadjiah Brooks and designation of email |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.