Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Edward J Hamblett, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand with Kathryn Weston presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathryn Weston Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Jury Trial |
to Unknown Party #2
Date: December 13, 2017to Edward J Hamblett etc
Date: December 13, 2017Edward H Hamblett aka Ed Hamblett
Date: January 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | to Albertelli Law | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2018209296 Book: 7610 Page: 4211 View: 2018209296 | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2018209298 Book: 7610 Page: 4214 View: 2018209298 | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | to Albertelli Law | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | to MTGLQ Investors LP (no $) Instrument: 2018209269 Book: 7610 Page: 4123 View: 2018209269 | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | reset | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | sale to 9/11/18 and cancels sale set for 8/7/18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.