Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mdtr Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2013 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Case Outcome TypeAfter Hearing - Other |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | w/prej by MDTR LLC Instrument: 2016104440 Book: 7262 Page: 4918 View: 2016104440 | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | of Samantha H Spencer, Esq | |
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference by MDTR,LLC | |
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | by MDTR LLC | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | ||
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.