Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
National Residential Assets Corp, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2013 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Jury Trial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | to WILLIAM NORIEGA, attorney | |
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | to Florida Foreclosure Attorneys PLC | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2014218047 Book: 7060 Page: 3184 View: 2014218047 | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2014217226 Book: 7060 Page: 1254 View: 2014217226 | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | to William Noriega | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | from records retention for exhibits from hrg/trl dtd 10-01-2014 | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.