Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2012 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event | agst John L Murphy,$9,449.81 Instrument: 2015021260 Book: 7080 Page: 4457 View: 2015021260 | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Wal-Mart Stores East LP | |
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | per judge's ja: case has been removed from September trial docket | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | of Wal-Mart Stores East LP | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | by Wal-Mart Stores East LP | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | w/o prejudice by John L Murphy Instrument: 2014158531 Book: 7027 Page: 4908 View: 2014158531 | |
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event | of Gwen Causey et al | |
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event | by Wal-Mart Stores East LP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.