Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America N A, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Default |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Joanna L Nieto | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Carlos W Nieto | |
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2014195038 Book: 7047 Page: 3767 View: 2014195038 | |
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2014195039 Book: 7047 Page: 3769 View: 2014195039 | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | agst Carlos W Nieto et al for $311,192.93 Instrument: 2014114412 Book: 7004 Page: 2569 View: 2014114412 | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | to William Noriega | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | of Carlos W Nieto & Joanna L Nieto etc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.