Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2010 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | by BAC Home Loans etc Instrument: 2011112642 Book: 6609 Page: 1964 View: 2011112642 | |
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Kevin Merkel | |
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Stacy Table | |
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Lack of Prosecution Hearing Notice for KEVIN MERKEL. | |
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Lack of Prosecution Hearing Notice for STACY TABLE. | |
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Lack of Prosecution Hearing Notice for GERALD D DAVIS, attorney for WACHOVIA BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. | |
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Lack of Prosecution Hearing Notice for LYNN MARIE VOUIS, attorney for BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P. | |
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Kevin Merkel | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | 60-Day Lack of Prosecution Notice to KEVIN MERKEL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.