Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wachovia Bank National Association, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts City Island Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2007 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCity Island Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | w/o prej by Wachovia Bank National Association Instrument: 2008146436 Book: 6257 Page: 1108 View: 2008146436 | |
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | no show - court dism on OTSC - 120 day rule | |
August 21, 2007 | Docket Event | to Wachovia Bank National Association shall appear before court on 11/05/07 @ 3:30pm & file a written statement at least 5 days prior to hearing or case shall be dismissed (rec) Instrument: 2007249502 Book: 6150 Page: 3681 View: 2007249502 | |
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event | 7/16/07 @ 11:15 by Wachovia Bank etc | |
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event | by Wachovia Bank National Association | |
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event | of Foreclosure and Taxation of Attorney's Fees and Costs w/attached Affidavits by Wachovia Bank, National Association | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Fabian Olaya on 3/26/07 notarized process service | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Jane Doe | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | John Doe | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | unknown spouse of Fabian Olaya |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.