Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hammett, Kayla, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hammett, Dylan Blake, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $5.00 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $5.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $5.00 Receipt Number MX 23674 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Status Conference scheduled on 11/16/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Type changed to Case Management for 11/16/2022 at 1000 AM | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 632022DR000132DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/16/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.