Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Leber, Christopher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Leber, Holly, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 31, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | WIFE'S SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO HUSBAND | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS GREAT OAK PROPERTIES OF NORTH FLORIDA LTD 10-26-2023 | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FROM NON PARTY | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FROM NON PARTY | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE RENASANT BANK 9-18-2023 | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FROM NON PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.