Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Harvey, Larry E, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Harvey, Susan C, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Hearing scheduled on 6/15/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
May 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | STANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER SUSAN HARVEY | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 632022DR000076DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/11/2022 | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.