Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Andrews, Kimberly Deese, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Andrews, Jeffery Lester, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION - AGREEMENT | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATED PARENTING PLAN | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Hearing scheduled on 6/15/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.