Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Culpepper, Jason E, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Culpepper, Brandy Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Case Management scheduled on 5/11/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 632022DR000058DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/29/2022 | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 20589 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.