Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Romero, Philip, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Davis-Romero, Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE ADDRESS ALONG WITH COPY OF LETTER WITH PHILIP ROMERO | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 7 assessed at sum $100.00 | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 7 Total Assessed $100.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $100.00 Receipt Number MX 23626 | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Status Conference scheduled on 10/12/2022 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Type changed to Hearing for 10/12/2022 at 1030 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.