Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Harrison, Mccabe G, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2022 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 21089 | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to MCCABE G HARRISON | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 632022CP000027CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2022 | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.