Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Blacknell, Penny Chante, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Blacknell, Preston Devon, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERPETITION | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEDIATION | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- PRESTON BLACKNELL | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- PRESTON BLACKNELL | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITION AND COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.