Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pinder, Amy Fairminir, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Patton, Kevin Lemuel, in the jurisdiction of Sumter County, FL, . Sumter County, FL Superior Courts with MORLEY, MICHELLE T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMORLEY, MICHELLE T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSumter County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON OBJECTION TO DRIVER'S LICENSE SUSPENSION REPORT OF THE CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CASE CLOSED | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT CASE HISTORY/PRINTOUT | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING USING ZOOM CONFERENCING | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT INTERCEPT PRINTOUT | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE IN CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | FLORIDA CERTIFICATE OF DEATH | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT INTERCEPT PRINTOUT | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM FROM DOR | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO DOR/CSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.