Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hardy, Randy Allen, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Canaday, Dale, Canaday, Rebecca, Lathrop, Tonya, Robert Slack Fine Homes Llc, Slack, Robert, (total of 5) See All represented by Singeltary, Cara Courtney, in the jurisdiction of Sumter County, FL, . Sumter County, FL Superior Courts with HALLMAN, WILLIAM HENRY III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHALLMAN, WILLIAM HENRY III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 27, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSumter County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
This complaint is filed by Randy Hardy against Dale Canaday and Rebecca Canaday. The jurisdiction and venue of this case are proper in the Fifth Judicial Circuit in Sumter County, Florida. Randy Hardy is a resident of Sumter County and owns a propert...
INVOICE TO RANDY HARDY - APPEAL FEES
Date: April 11, 2017LETTER FROM ATTORNEY TO CLERK OF COURT AS TO COPY
Date: April 17, 2017FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 06, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT DECLEARTION OF DEFENDANT REGARDING INCOME AND ASSETS INCLUDING THOSE EXEMPTED FROM GARNISHMENT FILED BY RANDY HARDY | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM THE FDCA - CASE DISMISSED | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CASE CLOSED | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET TO RECORD ON APPEAL | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLERK | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | EFILING CONFIRMATION -INDEX | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE ABSTRACT FILING | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER TO FDCA FROM CLERK | |
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF INDIGENCY FOR PURPOSES OF APPEAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.