Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sumter Electric Cooperative In, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Watson, William Grant, against The Middlesex Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Sumter County, FL, . Sumter County, FL Superior Courts with HATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHATCHER, MARY PAVLOFF Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSumter County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Sumter Electric Cooperative, Inc. (SECO) against The Middlesex Corporation. SECO is a Florida not-for-profit corporation and rural electric cooperative, while Middlesex is a Massachusetts corporation. The complaint alleges ...
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: September 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CASE CLOSED | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE RE-ASSIGNMENT | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGE RE-ASSIGNMENT | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFNDANT | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTION | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.