Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Smiley, Joan, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Celler, Richard Bernard, against Project Health Inc, in the jurisdiction of Sumter County, FL, . Sumter County, FL Superior Courts with HALLMAN, WILLIAM HENRY III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHALLMAN, WILLIAM HENRY III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSumter County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint was filed by Joan Smiley against Project Health, Inc. d/b/a Langley Health Services. Joan Smiley is an adult individual residing in Citrus County, Florida, while Project Health, Inc. is a Florida Non Profit Corporation operating in Sum...
SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROJECT HEALTH INC
Date: February 01, 2016COMPLAINT EXHIBIT 1 ATTACHED
Date: January 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY TO JUDGE HALLMAN | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CASE CLOSED | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET TO INTERROGATORIES | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY PIONEER HEALTH ALLIANCE INC | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF | |
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.