Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Fairwinds Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Stephen Orsillo, against Duane Shackelford, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2022 |
Category14N - Non Homestead/Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeClose Supplemental |
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: September 27, 2022CERTIFICATE /CERTIFICATION BY PLTF
Date: September 27, 2022NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT UNK PARTY IN POSSESSION BY PLTF
Date: November 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR ORIGINAL NOTE BY JAMIE BELL (NOT DATED) | |
May 02, 2023 | Hearing | FORECLOSURE SALE | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ORIGINALS TO SORENSON VAN LEUVEN PLLC | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION TO CANCEL FCLR SALE ON 5/2/23 VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FCLR RELEASE LIS PENDENS & DISMISS CASE & RETURN ORID LOAN DOCS - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 4/12/23Instrument: 2023033797 | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL SALE VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FCLR RELEASE LIS PENDENS & DISMISS CASE BY PLTF | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE ON 5/2/23 | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CALENDAR: FS HEARING FOR JUDGE [FS] ON 05/02/2023 AT 1100AM | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT $182,832.59 /SALE DATE 5/2/23 - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 3/20/23Instrument: 2023025668 | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) MAR 20 2023 @1:30PM | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE BY PLTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.