Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Riverbend At Cameron Heights Homeowners Association Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Karen Wonsetler, Sarah Webner, against Robert C Tobey, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with MARK E HERR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMARK E HERR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2022 |
Category14H - Homestead/Residential Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeClose Supplemental |
NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE BY PLTF
Date: October 13, 2022DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY KAREN J WONSETLER OBO PLTF
Date: October 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2023 | Hearing | FORECLOSURE SALE | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION /NOTICE OF SALE 12/14/23 | |
November 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE - JUDGE HERR 11/22/23 | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE HERR RE PROPOSED ORDER | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE HERR RE PROPOSED ORDER | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL SALE SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/23 BY PLTF | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FINAL JUDGMENT TO DEFT BY PLTF | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE ON 12/14/23 | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CALENDAR: FS HEARING FOR JUDGE [FS] ON 12/14/2023 AT 1100AM | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT $5,271.59 / SALE DATE 12/14/23 - JUDGE HERR 10/30/23Instrument: 2023099992 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.