Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Marquise Dd Mcmiller I, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Keona L Parker, represented by Vermotta Jackson, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JAMES J. DEKLEVA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAMES J. DEKLEVA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
Category19 - Contract/Indebted,Etc |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo After Hearing |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: January 20, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION & FOR SANCTIONS BY DEFT
Date: April 08, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA O/C TO PLTF
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY PLTF
Date: April 13, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION VERMOTTA HALL JACKSON ESQ OBO DEFT
Date: April 08, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - KEONA L PARKER ON 1/21/21
Date: January 25, 2021OPEN COURT MINUTES
Date: April 13, 2021TRIAL NOTIFICATION ON 5/11/21 @ 11:30 AM CTRM B
Date: April 13, 2021ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJ - JUDGE DEKLEVA 5/11/21Instrument: 2021063863
Date: May 11, 2021OPEN COURT MINUTES
Date: May 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJ - JUDGE DEKLEVA 5/11/21Instrument: 2021063863 | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT MINUTES | |
May 11, 2021 | Hearing |
TRIAL
Judge: JAMES J. DEKLEVA |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CALENDAR: TR HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] ON 05/11/2021 AT 1130AM | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY PLTF | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT MINUTES | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL NOTIFICATION ON 5/11/21 @ 11:30 AM CTRM B | |
April 13, 2021 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL
Judge: JAMES J. DEKLEVA |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION & FOR SANCTIONS BY DEFT | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION VERMOTTA HALL JACKSON ESQ OBO DEFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.