Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rhianna Cannon, filed a(n) case against Austin Schubert, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with Susan W. Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan W. Stacy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2022 | Hearing |
LACK OF PROSECUTION
Judge: SUSAN STACY |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL - LOPInstrument: 2022089435 | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL; A SCHUBERT NOTICE OF LOP REMAILED | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CALENDAR: LOP HEARING FOR JUDGE [W] ON 07/28/2022 AT 09:00 | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-29-S REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FROM DIVISION L TO DIVISION W | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | REASSIGNMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TO DIVISION L JUDGE RECKSIEDLER FROM DIVISION G JUDGE RUDISILL PER ADMIN ORDER 11-24-S AMENDED | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT / R CANNON | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET / BOTH PARTIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.