Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Todd Biltswitch, filed a(n) case against Larissa Cunningham, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with Michael J. Rudisill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Rudisill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2021 | Hearing |
INJUNCTION REVIEW
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL/ JUDGE RUDISILL 02/12/2021Instrument: 2021020067 | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT SHEET AND COURT MINUTES /PETITIONER WAS PRESENT | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INJUNCTION HEARING RETURNED SERVED 2/2/21 SCSO | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION SET FOR 02/12/2021 AT 0930AM @ SCC CR-TBD; JUDGE RUDISILL | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT *SUPPLEMENTAL* IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR INJUNCTION; PETITIONER | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPANION FILE(S): 2021-DR-0159-06D-G; 2013-DR-0177-05P-G; 2013-DR-0357-06D-G | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION DATA ENTRY SHEET | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLINATION FINAL HEARING/REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.