Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Carlos Javier Marchena, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by William Finn, against State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, State Farm Florida Insurance Company, represented by Alex Ramirez Jr, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with SUSAN STACY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSUSAN STACY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
Category16L - Other-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE PROCESS BY PLTF
Date: June 23, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL DIRECT APPRAISAL PANEL ETC IS DENIED /MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME IS GRANTED - JUDGE STACY 3/5/22 | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER TO HONORABL JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFT MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL DIRECT APPRAISAL PANEL TO PREPARE DELINEATED ITEMIZED APPRAISAL AWARD & STAY ACTION PENDING APPRAISAL - DENIED & MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF DISCOVERY - GRANTED - JUDGE STACY 2/27/22 | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FEB 14 2022 @1:30PM | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY WILLIAM FINN OBO PLTF | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE RE: PROPOSED ORDER | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STACY 9/25/21 | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER & NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING TO ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 2ND AMENDED CMPL ON 10/18/21 @ 3PM - JUDGE STACY 9/20/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.