Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Geoffrey Summitt, Stacy Summitt, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Michael Melli, against United Services Automobile Association, represented by Douglas Miller, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
Category15 - Contract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 11, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 11, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 9/3/21 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PLTFS | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE /SEPT 14 2021 @3:00PM - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 8/27/21 | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER BY DEFT | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY DOUGLAS F MILLER OBO DEFT | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY MICHAEL MELLI ESQ OBO PLTF | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSN 6/25/21 | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.