Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Adam Schumacher, Jennifer Schumacher, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Samantha Pearce, against First Protective Insurance Company, represented by Marc Gutterman, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
Category16L - Other-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Before Hrg-Other |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 10, 2021PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: June 10, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - FIRST PROTECTIVE INS CO DBA FRONTLINE INS
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT
Date: June 10, 2021COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 10, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE PROCESS BY PLTF
Date: June 23, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT
Date: June 10, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - FIRST PROTECTIVE INS CO DBA FRONTLINE INS CO 6/18/21
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MARC J GUTTERMAN ESQ OBO DEFT
Date: June 25, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT
Date: July 08, 2021DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY MARC J GUTTERMAN ESQ OBO DEFT
Date: June 25, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT
Date: July 28, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY GUTTERMAN TRIAL GROUP COUNSEL FOR DEFT
Date: September 08, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 9/9/21
Date: September 09, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES
Date: September 02, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY REQUEST BY DEFT
Date: August 02, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT
Date: September 01, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PTLF COMPLAINT BY DEFT
Date: August 23, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT
Date: August 12, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE /SEPT 14 2021 @3:00PM - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 8/27/21
Date: August 27, 2021VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF
Date: November 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 9/9/21 | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY GUTTERMAN TRIAL GROUP COUNSEL FOR DEFT | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE /SEPT 14 2021 @3:00PM - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 8/27/21 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PTLF COMPLAINT BY DEFT | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY REQUEST BY DEFT | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.