Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lianna Gerken, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Chad Lucas, against John Donnelly, represented by Karina Cabrera, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with DONNA L. MCINTOSH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDONNA L. MCINTOSH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
Category08 - Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 09, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT
Date: June 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY RISHER RUSHMER PA OBO DEFT | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT BY PLTF | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY BY DEFT | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT BY PLTF | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT BY PLTF | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.