Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Danielle L Kelly, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Charles Schwab, represented by Gretchen Lehman, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with MICHAEL J. RUDISILL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL J. RUDISILL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
Category09B - Malpractice - Business |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeClose Supplemental |
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 09, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - CHARLES SCHWAB O/C TO PLTF
Date: June 09, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE - JUDGE RUDISILL 7/26/21 | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CMPL BY PLTF | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CORRESPONDENCE FROM PLTF DANIELLE L KELLY RECEIVED 7/14/21 - JUDGE RUDISILL 7/16/21 | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER RE CHARLES SCHWAB BY PLTF | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO FILE ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE BY PLTF | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR RESUBMISSION OF HEARING BY PLTF | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SUBMIT EVIDENCE BY PLTF | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO MIDDLE DISTRICT BY DEFT (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING) | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR HEARING BY PLTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.