Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Tony L Smith, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Logan Templeton, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Adriana Pavon, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with SUSAN STACY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSUSAN STACY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
Category15 - Contract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Before Hrg-Other |
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES ATTACHED TO LETTER TO JUDGE STACY
Date: July 29, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 20, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO
Date: January 20, 2021COMPLAINT FILED
Date: January 20, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT
Date: January 20, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST TO PLTF BY DEFT
Date: February 26, 2021DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF
Date: January 20, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES 1ST SET BY DEFT
Date: February 26, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE BY PLTF
Date: January 20, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT
Date: February 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ADRIANA M PAVON OBO DEFT
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF TONY L SMITH ON 7/8/21 @ 10AM
Date: March 03, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFTS CORP REP ON 7/15/21 @ 10AM
Date: March 03, 2021NOTICE FOR TRIAL JURY (5) DAYS
Date: July 15, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF
Date: March 15, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES
Date: July 26, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT
Date: March 09, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF
Date: March 15, 2021NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO PTLF 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT
Date: March 12, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT
Date: March 12, 2021NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF LOGAN C TEMPLETON BY PLTF
Date: May 28, 2021PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT
Date: March 30, 2021NOTICE FOR TRIAL /JURY TRIAL (5) DAYS
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF RYAN RIGGS ON 5/10/21 @ 10AM
Date: April 08, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF RYAN RIGGS MAY 19 2021 @11:00AM
Date: May 10, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF FIRM ADDRESS BY TORRES VICTOR OBO DEFT
Date: May 29, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AUG 1 2022 - JUDGE STACY 7/28/21
Date: July 29, 2021LETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER
Date: June 02, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT BY DEFT
Date: February 01, 2022LETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER
Date: August 30, 2021LETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING AUG 19 2021 @9:30AM
Date: June 17, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE BY PARTIES
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION FEB 1 2022 @9:00AM
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 8/19/21 @ 9:30AM
Date: August 13, 2021JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING TRIAL DATE BY PARTIES
Date: August 11, 2021ORDER ON JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE - GRANTED - JUDGE STACY 8/29/21
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICT BY DEFT
Date: December 13, 2021CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIAITON BY PLTF
Date: January 03, 2022MEDIATION REPORT - NO AGREEMENT
Date: February 01, 2022WITNESS LIST BY PLTF
Date: January 26, 2022NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE FOR TRIAL BY PLTF
Date: September 16, 2021NOTICE FOR TRIAL /JURY TRIAL (5) DAYS
Date: February 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE & TRIAL DATE /PTC JUN 21 2022 @1:30PM/JURY TRIAL DURING THE (1) WEEK TRIAL PERIOD BEGINNING JUL 11 2022 - JUDGE STACY 2/25/22 | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL /JURY TRIAL (5) DAYS | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT BY DEFT | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT - NO AGREEMENT | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST BY PLTF | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIAITON BY PLTF | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICT BY DEFT | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - NOTICE & ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGMENT HEARING TO ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 21-24 2ND AMENDED- OCT 26 2021 @3:00PM - JUDGE STACY 10/4/21 | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE FOR TRIAL BY PLTF | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL /JURY TRIAL (5) DAYS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.