Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Miriam Torres, Noah Negron, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jared Wise, against Dm World Transportation Llc, Mezac Dede, represented by Rodney Janis, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with DONNA L. MCINTOSH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDONNA L. MCINTOSH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
Category08 - Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - HEADACHE & NEUROLOGICAL TREATMENT INSTITUTE
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC
Date: June 24, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - PARAMOUNT URGENT CARE
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - SIMONMED IMAGING
Date: June 10, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES BY PLTF
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY COMPLETE CARE CENTERS INC
Date: June 24, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY CENTRAL FL IMAGING
Date: June 24, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MIRIAM TORRES ON 8/3/21 @ 10AM
Date: July 07, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE
Date: June 24, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY PARAMOUNT URGENT CARE INC
Date: June 24, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY GEICO INS CO
Date: June 24, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT MEZAC DEDE BY PLTFS
Date: July 07, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NOAH NEGRON ON 8/3/21 @ 1PM
Date: July 07, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES BY PLTF NOAH NEGRON
Date: June 24, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY PARAMOUNT URGENT CARE
Date: June 24, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY RODNEY JANIS ESQ OBO DEFTS
Date: June 28, 2021REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS TO DEFT MEZAC DEDE BY PLTFS
Date: July 07, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT MEZAC DEDE BY PLTFS
Date: July 07, 2021REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS TO DEFT DM WORLD TRANSPORTATION LLC BY PLTFS
Date: July 07, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT DM WORLD TRANSPORTTATION LLC BY PLTFS
Date: July 07, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C HEADACHE & NEUROLOGICAL TREATMENT INSTITUTE 6/24/21
Date: July 13, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C PARAMOUNT URGENT CARE INC 7/9/21
Date: July 13, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C PARAMOUNT URGEN CARE 6/25/21
Date: July 13, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C CENTERS OF IMAGING 6/28/21
Date: July 13, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED GIECO INS CO 6/24/21
Date: July 13, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C ADCO BILLING SOLUTIONS 7/7/21
Date: July 13, 2021RESPONSE TO PLTFS REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS BY DEFT DM WORLD TRANSPORTATION LLC
Date: August 18, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT DM WORLD TRANSPORTATION LLC
Date: August 18, 2021RESPONSE TO PLTFS REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS BY DEFT MEZAC DEDE
Date: August 18, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED - R/C INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE 7/9/21
Date: September 13, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT MEZAC DEDE
Date: August 18, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT MEZAC DEDE
Date: August 20, 2021PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT DM WORLD TRANSPORTATION LLC
Date: August 18, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED - R/C GEICO INS CO 7/12/21
Date: September 13, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED - R/C COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC DBA INTERVENTIONAL ASSOC 7/12/21
Date: September 13, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED - R/C CENTRAL FL IMAGING 7/12/21
Date: September 13, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED - R/C COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC DBA INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE 7/14/21
Date: September 13, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED - R/C PARAMOUNT URGENT CARE 7/9/21
Date: September 13, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED - R/C COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC DBA INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE 7/16/21
Date: September 13, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED - R/C SIMON MED IMAGING 6/24/21
Date: September 13, 2021LETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE SPRYSENSKI REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER
Date: December 17, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION UPDATE/SUPPLEMENTAL TO PLTF MIRIAM TORRES BY DEFTS
Date: October 15, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION UPDATE SUPPLEMENTAL BY PLTFS
Date: November 17, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES
Date: December 07, 2021ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 1/5/22 @ 3:30PM - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 12/3/21
Date: December 03, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS COLLATERAL SOURCE TO PTLF MIRIAM TORRES BY DEFTS
Date: January 28, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF MIRIAM TORRES
Date: February 25, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY LAW FIRM OF GOLDBERG SEGALLAS COUNSEL FOR DEFTS
Date: January 28, 2022REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION UPDATE TO PLTF MIRIAM TORRES BY DEFTS
Date: January 28, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 12/16/21
Date: December 17, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION IN COMPLIANCE WITH MEDICARE SECONDARY PAYOR ACT BY DEFTS
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES UPDATED TO PTLF MIRIAM TORRES BY DEFTS
Date: January 28, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS MEDICARE TO PTLF NOAH NEGRON BY DEFTS
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES MEDICARE TO PLTF MIRIAM TORRES BY DEFTS
Date: January 28, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS MEDICARE TO PLTF MIRIAM TORRES BY DEFTS
Date: January 28, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY PLTF
Date: February 04, 2022REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION UPDATE TO PLTF NOAH NEGRON BY DEFTS
Date: January 28, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS COLLATERAL SOURCE TO PLTF NOAH NEGRON BY DEFTS
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF MIRIAM TORRES
Date: February 25, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES MEDICARE TO PTLF NOAH NEGRON BY DEFTS
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES UPDATED TO PTLF NOAH NEGRON BY DEFTS
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - GEICO INS CO
Date: February 11, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES BY PLTF MIRIAM TORRES
Date: February 10, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - INTEGRITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC
Date: February 10, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES BY PLTF MIRIAM TORRES
Date: February 11, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF NOAH NEGRON
Date: February 25, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - GEICO INS CO
Date: February 10, 2022SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C GEICO INS CO 2/28/22
Date: March 04, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF NOAH NEGRON
Date: February 25, 2022SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C GEICO GENERAL INS CO 2/25/22
Date: March 04, 2022SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C INTEGRITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC 2/24/22
Date: March 17, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED - MEZAC DEDE
Date: January 19, 2021COMPLAINT FILED
Date: January 19, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 19, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFTS BY PLTFS
Date: February 18, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF NOAH NEGRON BY DEFTS
Date: February 22, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - DM WORLD TRANSPORTATION LLC
Date: January 19, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PTLF COMPLAINT BY DEFTS
Date: February 18, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DM WORLD TRANSPORTATION LLC 1/22/21
Date: January 28, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MEZAC DEDE 1/29/21
Date: February 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY RODNEY JANIS ESQ OBO DEFTS
Date: February 05, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF MIRIAM BY DEFTS
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF MIRIAM TORRES BY DEFTS
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF NOAH NEGRON BY DEFT
Date: February 22, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF MIRIAM TORRES BY DEFTS
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF MIRIAM TORRES
Date: March 22, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF MIRIAM TORRES
Date: March 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF NOAH NEGRON BY DEFTS
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF NOAH NEGRON
Date: March 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEFTS BY PLTF MIRIAM TORRES
Date: April 26, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF NOAH NEGRON
Date: March 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEFTS BY PLTF NOAH NEGRON
Date: April 26, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MIRIAM TORRES ON 7/8/21 @ 10AM
Date: May 18, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NOAH NEGRON ON 7/8/21 @ 1PM
Date: May 18, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - ADCO BILLING SOLUTIONS
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - COMPLETE CARE CENTERS INC
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - CENTERS FOR IMAGING
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - GEICO INS CO
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - PARAMOUNT URGENT CARE INC
Date: June 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C INTEGRITY MEDICAL GROUP LLC 2/24/22 | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C GEICO INS CO 2/28/22 | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C GEICO GENERAL INS CO 2/25/22 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF MIRIAM TORRES | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF MIRIAM TORRES | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF NOAH NEGRON | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF NOAH NEGRON | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - GEICO INS CO | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES BY PLTF MIRIAM TORRES | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES BY PLTF MIRIAM TORRES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.