Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jacqueline Thompson, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Katherine Krepfle, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Julie Tyk, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
Category15 - Contract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT
Date: January 19, 2021COMPLAINT FILED
Date: January 19, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFT CORP REP SEPT 19 2022 @10:00AM | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF BRETT BLANCHFIELD ON 7/8/22 @ 2PM | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR BETTER RESPONSES AS TO PRODUCTION DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLTF 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OR ALTERNATIVE IN CAMERA INSPECTION BY PLTF | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES AMENDED BY JULIE A TYK ESQ OBO DEFT | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES BY DEFT | |
January 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (AMENDED) BY DEFT | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLTFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 12/9/21 | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES BY PLTF | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFTS CORP REP ON 6/3/22 @ 10AM | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JACQUELINE THOMPSON MAR 21 2022 @10:00AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.