Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Michael Eisenband, against Dawn R Buday, Springleaf Financial Services, represented by Randy Hillman, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with DEBRA S. NELSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEBRA S. NELSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2012 |
Category14H - Homestead/Residential Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Before Hrg-Other |
ANSWER TO CMPL BY DEFT DAWN R BUDAY
Date: November 14, 2012COMPLAINT FILED
Date: October 17, 2012NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY PLTFInstrument: 2013127381
Date: October 01, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY PLTFInstrument: 2013127381
Judge: DEBRA S. NELSON |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS OF WILLIAM NORIEGA ESQ OBO FOR
Judge: DEBRA S. NELSON |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: DEBRA S. NELSON |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING UNK TENANT #1, #2 BY PLTF
Judge: DEBRA S. NELSON |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT & ATTYS FEES & COSTS BY PLTF
Judge: DEBRA S. NELSON |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ENTERED - 3/28/13 AGST SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES SUCCESSOR TO AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SERVICES
Judge: DEBRA S. NELSON |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING PLTFS MOTN FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF
Judge: DEBRA S. NELSON |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO CMPL BY DEFT DAWN R BUDAY
Judge: DEBRA S. NELSON |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RTND UNSERVED UNK TENANT #2
Judge: DEBRA S. NELSON |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RTND UNSERVED UNK TENANT #1
Judge: DEBRA S. NELSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.