Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Fagen, Jessica, against Constant, Jeff, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with GALEN, PHYLLIS R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGALEN, PHYLLIS R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims Between $500.01-$2,500 (South County) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)
Date: September 07, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - JEFF CONSTANT
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Date: February 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORT - MEDIATOR | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - CONSENT JUDGMENT | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING COURT DATE | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 12/15/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 2 , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - JEFF CONSTANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.