Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Scherr, Harold, against Goldstein, Marcia, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with UZABEL, MARYANN OLSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUZABEL, MARYANN OLSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims Between $500.01-$2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500
Date: June 10, 2021ORDER SETTING COURT DATE - WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS
Date: July 30, 2021ORDER - ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: August 27, 2021ORDER SETTING COURT DATE
Date: July 16, 2021SUMMONS SERVED - MARIA GOLDSTEIN
Date: June 22, 2021COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: August 26, 2021PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021050307
Date: June 10, 2021SUMMONS- PROPOSED
Date: June 10, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 10, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MARCIA GOLDSTEIN
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING COURT DATE - WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/26/2021 AT 2:00 PM IN 2 , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING COURT DATE | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - MARIA GOLDSTEIN | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MARCIA GOLDSTEIN | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 07/06/2021 AT 2:00 PM IN 2 , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021050307 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.