Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Moehle, Kristina, against Bornik, Grazyna T, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with Moss, Dana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoss, Dana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims Between $2,501.01-$5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500
Date: June 10, 2021WRIT RETURNED - GARNISHMENT - SERVED - JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA
Date: November 16, 2022NOTICE - TO DEFENDANT
Date: December 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023096597) | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION - FOR ENTRY OF FINAL GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT - OF COSTS | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE - TO DEFENDANT | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - CHASE BANK | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED - GARNISHMENT - SERVED - JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE -PURSUANT TO F.S. 77.041 AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | WRIT ISSUED- GARNISHMENT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2022094954 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.